EP1792804 - Motor-driven power steering system for a vehicle with a device for adjusting the tension of a transmission belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mando Corporation 343-1 Manho-ri, Poseung-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Jun-gyu, 1102-504, Geum-gang Apt. Mujigaemaeul, Gumi-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jo, Heegwon 724-2002,Daerim Solgeo Apt. Gungae-dong Gungpo-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Namgung, Joo 301, 943-9, Dangye-dong Wonju-si, Gangwon-do / KR | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250895.7 | 20.02.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | KR20050116463 | 01.12.2005 Original published format: KR 2005116463 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792804 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
B62D5/0424 (EP,US);
F16H7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Von einem Motor angetriebene Servolenkung für ein Fahrzeug mit einer Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Spannung eines Treibriemens | [2007/23] | English: | Motor-driven power steering system for a vehicle with a device for adjusting the tension of a transmission belt | [2007/23] | French: | Direction assistée entraînée par moteur pour un véhicule avec un dispositif pour ajuster la tension d' une courroie de transmission | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10304189 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062]; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US6644432 (YOST SANDI M [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004043854 (FRALEY RICHARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO03011674 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 5 * |