EP1698325 - Compositions containing amines and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2016/31] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. 199 Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Southall, Michael D. 200 Berwyn Place Lawrenceville, NJ 08558 / US | 02 /
Martin, Katharine 1 High Mowing Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 03 /
Lukenbach, Elvin R. 160 Klinesville Road Flemington, NJ 0882 / US | 04 /
Bordoloi, Binoy K. 8 Slack Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 05 /
Kizoulis, Menas 640 Evergreen Parkway Union, NJ 07083 / US | 06 /
Pappas, Apostolos 8 Bloomingdale Drive Apt. 612 Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 07 /
Salerno, Catherine Stubler 19 Francine Place Millington, NJ 07946 / US | 08 /
Ruvolo, Eduardo 3 Orchard Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 09 /
Mitchell, Phyllis 30 Spring Brook Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 10 /
Tierney, Neena 1081 Drew Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 11 /
King, Deanna L. 4484 North Leavitt Road Warren, OH 44485 / US | 12 /
Lin, Connie Baozhen 15 Reid Avenue Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 13 /
Scarpa, Richard Charles 22 River Terrace Apt. 1L New York, NY 10282 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
Southall, Michael D. 200 Berwyn Place Lawrenceville, NJ 08558 / US | ||
02 /
Martin, Katharine 1 High Mowing Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | |||
03 /
Lukenbach, Elvin R. 160 Klinesville Road Flemington, NJ 0882 / US | |||
04 /
Bordoloi, Binoy K. 8 Slack Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
05 /
Kizoulis, Menas 640 Evergreen Parkway Union, NJ 07083 / US | |||
06 /
Pappas, Apostolos 8 Bloomingdale Drive Apt. 612 Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | |||
07 /
Salerno, Catherine Stubler 19 Francine Place Millington, NJ 07946 / US | |||
08 /
Ruvolo, Eduardo 3 Orchard Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | |||
09 /
Mitchell, Phyllis 30 Spring Brook Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
10 /
Tierney, Neena 1081 Drew Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | |||
11 /
King, Deanna L. 4484 North Leavitt Road Warren, OH 44485 / US | |||
12 /
Lin, Connie Baozhen 15 Reid Avenue Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | |||
13 /
Scarpa, Richard Charles 22 River Terrace Apt. 1L New York, NY 10282 / US | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/51] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251018.5 | 24.02.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | US20050066362 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 66362 | US20050223032 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: US 223032 | US20050312984 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: US 312984 | US20060351865 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 351865 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698325 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698325 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/97, A61K31/13 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Amine und deren Verwendung | [2006/36] | English: | Compositions containing amines and use thereof | [2006/36] | French: | Compositions contenant des amines et leur utilisation | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2006 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 24.02.2017 | LU | 24.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.02.2006 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.02.2006 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03026680 (DERMATRENDS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,12,19,21-23 * page 18, lines 4,5,16 * * page 19, line 22 - page 20, line 26 * * page 11, line 4 * * page 23; table 3 * * claims 1-10,20-25,40-46,48,52-61,71-76,83-85 *; | [X]DE202004006865U (SCHWAN STABILO COSMETICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,13-23 * page 2, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 5, paragraphs 24,25 * * page 6; example 2 * * page 7; example 4 * * claim - *; | [X]JPH11269096 ; | [X]US5013545 (BLACKMAN STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 5-7,19,22,23 * examples 4,6; claim - *; | [X]WO9951213 (ILENCHUK THEODORE TONEY [CA], et al) [X] 5-7,19 * claims 1,2,4,6 * * page 20, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]EP1216696 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1192940 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 13-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1513053 (HENKEL KG) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0862914 (PANNOC CHEMIE N V [BE]) [A] 1-24 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]WO9733560 (SCHERING PLOUGH HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1-24 * claim - *; | [A]WO0074699 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER FR [FR], et al) [A] 1-24 * example -; claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 53, Database accession no. 1999-615559, XP002386027 & JPH11269096 A 19991005 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 5-7,19,21-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * | by applicant | WO0170132 | US4822604 | EP0023978 | US4749507 | US3916008 | US2697118 | US5976556 | US2002197219 | US2002197281 | US2003138388 | US2003232743 | US5618519 | US5384116 | US5227459 | US2005129633 | US5744125 | US5225435 | US5218079 | US5216116 | US2004105905 | - BHIDE MV, IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (1985), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 303 - 312 | - INTERNATIONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK, THE COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOC., (1997), pages 1656 - 61 | - ICI HANDBOOK, pages 1693 - 1697 | - ICI HANDBOOK, pages 1673 - 1686 | - ICI HANDBOOK, pages 1650 - 1667 | - ICI HANDBOOK, page 1626 | - GIAEVER; KEESE, PROCEEDINGS OF NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1991), vol. 88, page 7896 | - WEGENER J; KEESE CR; GIAEVER I, EXP CELL RES., (2000), vol. 259, pages 158 - 166 | - HAMAMOTO Y., EXP DERMATOL, (1993), vol. 2, pages 231 - 235 | - GUY R. H., ARCH. DERMATOL RES, (1982), vol. 273, pages 91 - 95 | - KOLLIAS N, PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL., (1992), pages 223 - 227 | - GREENE, JID, (1970), vol. 54, pages 240 - 247 | - THODY, A. J.; SHUSTER, S., PHYSIOLOG. REV., (1989), vol. 69, pages 383 - 415 | - CHIBA, J BIOCHEM MOL TOXICOL., (2001), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 150 - 158 | - AISEN E, ACTA DERM VENEREOL., (1997), vol. 77, pages 142 - 143 | - STEWART ME, J INVEST DERMATOL., (1984), vol. 82, pages 74 - 78 | - SHALITA AR, CLIN THER., (2004), vol. 26, pages 1865 - 1873 | - PAPPAS, J INVEST DERMATOL., (200201), vol. 118, no. 1, pages 164 - 171 | - GUY; KEALY, DERMATOLOGY, (1998), vol. 196, no. 1, pages 16 - 20 |