EP1705426 - Combustor cooling hole pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burd, Steven W. 36 Renee Court Cheshire Connecticut 06410 / US | 02 /
Cheung, Albert K. 46 Viola Drive East Hampton Connecticut 06426 / US | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251068.0 | 28.02.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | US20050069095 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: US 69095 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705426 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705426 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23R3/06 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Konfiguration der Kühlungsbohrungen einer Brennkammer | [2006/39] | English: | Combustor cooling hole pattern | [2006/39] | French: | Configuration d'orifices de refroidissement d'une chambre de combustion | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Request for further processing for: | 05.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.12.2011 | FR | 29.02.2012 | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/50] | IT | 28.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2692014 (MACCRACKEN CALVIN D) [X] 1,2,7,19-23,25,27 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0943868 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,15,19-23,25,31,33 * page 3, line 13 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0972992 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 16,17 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 16; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1001222 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,23* column 4, line 12 - line 46; figure 3 *; | [Y]US6513331 (BROWN DANIEL DALE [US], et al) [Y] 10-13,28,29,32 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 37; figure 3 *; | [XY]EP1363075 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,7,15,19-23,25,31,33 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 33; figure 5 * [Y] 10-13,16,17,28,29,32 |