EP1783594 - Dynamic change of the storage capacity of a storage system comprising virtual volumes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/19] | Data management method in storage pool and virtual volume in dkc | ||
[2011/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eguchi, Yoshiaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. I.P.G. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cter. Bldg., 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/45] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Eguchi, Yoshiaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. I.P.G. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cter. Bldg., 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/19] | Hodsdon, Stephen James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251125.8 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | JP20050291005 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005291005 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783594 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783594 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/0608 (EP,US);
G06F3/0631 (US);
G06F3/0626 (US);
G06F3/0649 (EP,US);
G06F3/0665 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2008/03] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Änderung der Speicherkapazität von einem Speichersystem mit virtuellen Volumen | [2011/21] | English: | Dynamic change of the storage capacity of a storage system comprising virtual volumes | [2011/21] | French: | Changement dynamique de la capacité de stockage d'un système de stockage comprenant des volumes virtuels | [2011/21] |
Former [2007/19] | Datenverwaltungsverfahren in einem Speicherpool und virtuelle Volumen im dkc | ||
Former [2007/19] | Data management method in storage pool and virtual volume in dkc | ||
Former [2007/19] | Méthode de gestion des données dans la réserve de stockage et volumes virtuels dans dkc | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 13.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 02.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2013/08] |
Former [2013/07] | FR | 02.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1310876 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [X]US2005108292 (BURTON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,18-22,29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005120175 (SHIMADA AKINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0106] *; | [X]EP1569083 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-29 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2003015915 | GB2406406 | EP1569083 |