EP1701500 - Communications system with distributed risk management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WeDo Technologies (UK) Limited Suite 233 Davidson House Forbury Square Reading RG1 3EU / GB | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states WeDo Technologies (UK) Limited Atlantic House Imperial Way Reading Berkshire RG2 0TD / GB | ||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Praesidium Technologies Ltd Atlantic House, Imperial Way Reading RG2 OTD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Simon Christopher c/o Praesidium Technologies Ltd. Atlantic House, Imperial Way Reading RG2 0TD / GB | [2010/36] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Collins, Simon C. c/oPraesidium Technologies Ltd. Atlantic House, Imperial Way Reading RG2 0TD / GB | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251221.5 | 08.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | GB20050004772 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0504772 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701500 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701500 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1701500 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,GB);
H04L41/00 (GB);
H04L43/00 (GB);
H04L43/065 (GB)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | H04L29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem mit verteiltem Risikomanagement | [2006/37] | English: | Communications system with distributed risk management | [2006/37] | French: | Système de communication avec gestion de risque distribuée | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | BE | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | IT | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | LU | 08.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LU | 08.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
LU | 08.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
LU | 08.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.02.2011 | |
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19955018 (DATAKOM GES FUER DATENKOMMUNIK [DE]); | [X]DE10024234 (CINELINE PRINT & PROMOTION GMB [DE]); | [X]US2003110394 (SHARP CLIFFORD F [US], et al); | [X]US6654589 (HAUMONT SERGE [FI]); | [X]US2004025044 (DAY CHRISTOPHER W [US]) | by applicant | DE19955018 | WO02075339 | US2003101357 | US6654589 |