EP1793521 - Variable distribution of common pilot symbols in OFDM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ode, Takayoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yokoyama, Hitoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251409.6 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | JP20050345325 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005345325 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793521 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02, H04L27/26 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/26132 (KR);
H04L1/0026 (KR);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0085 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Variable Verteilung von allgemeinen Pilotsymbolen in OFDM | [2007/23] | English: | Variable distribution of common pilot symbols in OFDM | [2007/23] | French: | Distribution variable de symboles pilotes communs en OFDM | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/12] | 01.04.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/12] | Appeal following examination | 08.06.2011 | Appeal received No. T2078/11 | 11.08.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 12.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1542488 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-21 * figures 4,5a,5b * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030] *; | [PX]US2006013338 (GORE DHANANJAY A [US], et al) [PX] 1-21* paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0043] , [0062] * |