EP1713286 - System and method for providing calibration/verification services at a CATV service organization site on a prepaid basis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acterna, L.L.C 5808 Churchman Bypass Indianapolis Indiana, 46203-6109 / US | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgett, Doug 22 W. Flat Rock Road Flat Rock, Indiana 47234 / US | 02 /
Swanson, Brian 15129 Smithfield Drive Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 03 /
Robertson, William 21723 Deer Point Xing Bradenton, Florida 34202 / US | 04 /
Zeyak, Michael 403 Cranberry Dr. Greenfield, Indiana 46140 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Fulton, David James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fulton, David James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Fulton, David James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Ede, Eric, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/42] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Kennedys Patent Agency Limited 185 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251750.3 | 30.03.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | US20050104313 | 11.04.2005 Original published format: US 104313 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713286 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1713286 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00, G07F7/00 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
H04N17/00 (EP,US);
H04N21/418 (EP,US);
H04N21/4182 (EP,US);
H04N21/4185 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | H04N17/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/22] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Prepaid-basiertes System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Verifikations- und Kalibrierungsdiensten in einem Standort zur Organisation von CATV-Diensten | [2006/42] | English: | System and method for providing calibration/verification services at a CATV service organization site on a prepaid basis | [2006/42] | French: | Système et procédé pour fournir des services de calibration et de vérification dans un site d'organisation de services CATV basés sur un prepaiement | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4624578 (GREEN DAVID L [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 48-60 * * column 2, lines 29-32 *; | [X]GB2236422 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1-20 * page 1 * * page 3, lines 23-26 *; | [X]EP1431932 (SANIRENT S L [ES]) [X] 1-20* page 1, paragraphs 3,4,6 * |