EP1707314 - Polishing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikoshi Machinery Corporation 1650 Kiyono Matsushiro-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-1233 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Fujikoshi Machinery Corporation 1650 Kiyono, Matsushiro-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-1233 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashita, Tadakazu c/o Fujikoshi Machinery Corp. 1650, Kiyono Matsushiro-machi Nagano 381-1233 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yoshikazu c/o Fujikoshi Machinery Corp. 1650, Kiyono Matsushiro-machi Nagano 381-1233 / JP | 03 /
Nomura, Yoshiyuki c/o Fujikoshi Machinery Corp. 1650, Kiyono Matsushiro-machi Nagano 381-1233 / JP | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/40] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251753.7 | 30.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050106895 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005106895 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1707314 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707314 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/68728 (EP,US);
B24B37/04 (KR);
B24B37/345 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/68735 (EP,US);
H01L21/68785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Poliervorrichtung | [2006/40] | English: | Polishing apparatus | [2006/40] | French: | Dispositif de polissage | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 27.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0347718 (WESTECH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * column 2, lines 18-30 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 33 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 34 * * figures 1,8A-8E * * abstract *; | [X]EP0911114 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,9-14 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] * * figures 1-4,5A-5G,7,8,11A-11G,12 *; | [A]US2002124373 (KATSUOKA SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 2* paragraph [0058] *; | [X]US2004127142 (OLGADO DONALD J K [US]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * the whole document * |