|
18.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |