EP1710724 - Application program verification system, application program verification method and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yuuki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1 Nagata-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Ukiana, Tomooki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1 Nagata-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2013/29] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yuuki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1 Nagata-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Ukiana, Tomooki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1 Nagata-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/29] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251927.7 | 05.04.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | JP20050108885 | 05.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005108885 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710724 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710724 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710724 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G06F21/14 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F21/12 (EP,US);
G06F21/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2012/49] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überprüfungssystem für ein Anwendungsprogramm, Überprüfungsverfahren für ein Anwendungsprogramm und Computerprogramm | [2006/41] | English: | Application program verification system, application program verification method and computer program | [2006/41] | French: | Système de vérification du programme d'application, méthode de vérification du programme d'application et programme informatique | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 07.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0686906 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 58 *; | [A]EP0778522 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 5, line 2 - line 16 * * page 6, line 6 - line 17 *; | [A]US6070239 (MCMANIS CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 34 * * column 5, line 1 - column 8, line 27 *; | [A]US2002053024 (HASHIMOTO MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0058] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A]US2002067833 (HAN CHING-CHIH JASON [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO02069118 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract ** page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 5 * | by applicant | EP0778522 | US2002053024 |