EP1713091 - Method of manufacture of semiconductor device and conductive compositions used therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Yueli L. 229 Sarazen Meadow Way Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | 02 /
Young, Richard John Sheffield 6 Suffolk House Weston Lake Bath, BA1 4AB / GB | 03 /
Carroll, Alan Frederick 2316 Pastille Lane Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | 04 /
Hang, Kenneth Warren 9 Steepleton Court Hillsborough, North Carolina 27278 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252073.9 | 13.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | US20050106329 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: US 106329 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713091 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1713091 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713091 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22, H01L31/0224, H01L23/498 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
C03C14/006 (EP,US);
C03C3/064 (EP,US);
C03C3/072 (EP,US);
C03C3/0745 (EP,US);
C03C8/10 (EP,US);
C03C8/12 (EP,US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C03C8/16 (EP,US);
C03C8/18 (EP,US);
C03C8/20 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
C03C2214/08 (EP,US);
C03C2214/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer Halbleitervorrichtung und darin verwendete leitfähige Zusammensetzungen | [2006/42] | English: | Method of manufacture of semiconductor device and conductive compositions used therein | [2006/42] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur et composés conducteurs utilisés dans celui-ci | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 18.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.04.2011 | [2012/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1465209 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0041]; table 1 * [Y] 4,5,8-10; | [X]US2003108664 (KODAS TOIVO T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0043] - [0059] - [0217] - [0257] *; | [Y]US5645765 (ASADA EIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, line 21 - column 6, line 54; table 1 *; | [Y]US4256513 (YOSHIDA MANABU, et al) [Y] 8-10 * column 6, line 27 - column 18, line 59; figures 1a-1c * |