Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
03.10.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
09.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.10.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
13.10.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |