Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008534989 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP309624 | 09.05.2006 | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006121180 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2007 | A3 | WO2006121180 | 16.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7596496 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2009 | B2 | US2006253283 | 09.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1722357 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | A3 | EP1722357 | 15.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101080765 | 28.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2426166 | 17.10.2007 | B | GB2426166 | 15.11.2006 | A | GB0509415D0 | 15.06.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0509415 | 09.05.2005 |