EP1725084 - Discharge lamp energizing circuit and method of energizing discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotta, Souzaburou, L.A. I.P.D. NGK Insulators Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Sekiya, Takayuki, L.A. I.P.D. NGK Insulators Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Sakuma, Takeshi, L.A. I.P.D. NGK Insulators Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252504.3 | 12.05.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20050141645 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005141645 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1725084 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1725084 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/288, H05B41/38 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
H05B41/2882 (EP,US);
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/15] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Betreiben einer Entladungslampe | [2006/47] | English: | Discharge lamp energizing circuit and method of energizing discharge lamp | [2006/47] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour alimenter une lampe à décharge | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0390699 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2645392 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, lines 4-12 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 13 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 33 * * page 11, line 6 - page 15, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2674723 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | Examination | WO0169985 |