Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1741491T | 30.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | EP06252531 | 15.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7461804 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2008 | B2 | US2007001040 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1741491 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | B1 | EP1741491 | 10.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE413226T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006003474D1 | 18.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1741491T | 09.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2317456T | 16.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2427818 | 10.01.2007 | A | GB0513706D0 | 10.08.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0513706 | 04.07.2005 |