EP1860201 - Conversion method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP p.l.c. 1 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4PD / GB | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Hymers, Ronald Robson, et al BP International Limited Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Hymers, Ronald Robson, et al BP International Limited, Patents & Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252728.8 | 25.05.2006 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860201 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C13K1/02, C08B1/00, C12P7/10 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C08B1/003 (EP,US);
C13K1/02 (EP,CN,US);
C08B1/00 (CN);
C08B15/00 (EP,US);
C08B15/02 (CN);
C12P7/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | GB [2008/32] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Konvertierungsverfahren | [2007/48] | English: | Conversion method | [2007/48] | French: | Procédé de conversion | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/32] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2008/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004015146 (CIBA SPEC CHEM WATER TREAT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * example 1; claims 1-7,19 *; | [Y]WO9517517 (CONTROLLED ENVIRONMENT SYST [US]) [Y] 1-17 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO03029329 (UNIV ALABAMA [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * examples 1-5; claims 1-16 *; | [Y]WO2005017001 (KEMIRA OYJ [FI], et al) [Y] 1-17 * examples 1-3; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO2005066374 (KEMIRA OYJ [FI], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 6, lines 16-18; examples 1-5; claims 1,4,9-13 *; | [Y]JP2002003478 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US1943176 (CHARLES GRAENACHER) [A] 1-17 * examples 1-14; claims 1-14-17 *; | [A] - SWATLOSKI R P ET AL, "DISSOLUTION OF CELLOSE WITH IONIC LIQUIDS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2002), vol. 124, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4974 - 4975, XP001166990 [A] 1-17 * page 4974, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 4975, paragraphs 3,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja025790m |