EP1736777 - Immunochromatographic diagnostic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porvair Filtration Group Limited Fareham Industrial Park Fareham Hampshire PO16 8XG / GB | For all designated states British Biocell International Limited Golden Gate Ty Glas Avenue Cardiff South Glamorgan CF4 5DX / GB | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Porvair Filtration Group Limited Fareham Industrial Park Fareham Hampshire PO16 8XG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quinlan, Kevin c/o Porvair Filtration Group Ltd Fareham Industrial Park Fareham Hampshire, PO16 8XG / GB | 02 /
Amey, John c/o Porvair Filtration Group Ltd Fareham Industrial Park Fareham Hampshire, PO16 8XG / GB | 03 /
Whitworth, Emma c/o British Biocell International Golden Gate Ty Glas Avenue Cardiff, CF14 5DX / GB | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252998.7 | 09.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | GB20050012323 | 16.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0512323 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736777 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736777 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, G01N33/543, G01N33/558, B01L3/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP,GB);
G01N33/521 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/558 (EP,GB);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L9/52 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | G01N33/52, G01N33/543, G01N33/558 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Immunochromatographische diagnostische Vorrichtung | [2006/52] | English: | Immunochromatographic diagnostic device | [2006/52] | French: | Dispositif immunochromatographique de diagnostic | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2010 | 30.06.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4693834 (HOSSOM MILES G [US]); | [X]EP0267519 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [X]US5135873 (PATEL RAJESH D [US], et al); | [X]GB2349349 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]US6187598 (MAY KEITH [GB], et al); | [X]EP1369473 (CHOLESTECH CORP [US]) |