EP1736196 - Injection port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byrum, Randal T. 1738 Westport Drive Kings Mill Ohio 45034 / US | 02 /
Uth, Joshua 7752 Hunters Trail Mason Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
Conlon, Sean P. 6234 C North Shadow Hill Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | 04 /
Chen, How-Lun 4618 Belleview Ave. Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253276.7 | 23.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | US20050166611 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: US 166611 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736196 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736196 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736196 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1736196 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/02, A61M39/04 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A61M39/0208 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (KR);
A61B1/313 (KR);
A61M25/01 (KR);
A61M39/04 (EP,US);
A61M5/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Injektionszugang | [2006/52] | English: | Injection port | [2006/52] | French: | Accès d'injection | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2009
11.12.2012
WITHDRAWN ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2009
11.12.2012
WITHDRAWN ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2009
15.05.2009
ADMISSIBLE ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2009
ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative Becher, Claus Thomas, et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | 15.06.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.12.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.04.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.06.2012 | Appeal received No. T1420/12 | 11.09.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.12.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | LT | 06.08.2008 | LV | 06.08.2008 | RO | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | IS | 06.12.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | IE | 23.06.2009 | LU | 23.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/02] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CY | 06.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
TR | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
LU | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
LU | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
LU | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 06.08.2008 | |
IS | 06.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4543088 (BOOTMAN MATTHEW W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 15 - line 42 * * figure 7 *; | [X]US4781680 (REDMOND RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 30 - line 47 * * column 5, line 45 - line 56 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4840615 (HANCOCK JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 41 - line 60 ** figures 18,19 *; | [X]DE4211045 (MILOSEVIC ZELJKO [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9701370 (SIMS DELTEC INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 11, line 6 - line 13 * * figures 13,14 *; | [A]EP0858814 (TRICUMED GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 6 * * figure - * | by applicant | US4781680 | DE4211045 | US2004254537 | Opposition | US710174 | US4685447 | US4692146 | US4762517 | US4978338 | US5006115 | US5133753 | US2001056266 | US6478783 | US6527754 |