EP1744268 - RFID tag and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Kosuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | 02 /
Homma, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | 03 /
Odashima, Hitoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | 04 /
Kanda, Naoya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | 05 /
Ueda, Kie c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | [2010/16] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Inoue, Kosue Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | ||
02 /
Homma, Hiroshi Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
03 /
Odashima, Hitoshi Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
04 /
Kanda, Naoya Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
05 /
Ueda, Kie Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
Former [2007/03] | 01 /
Inoue, Kosue Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | ||
02 /
Homma, Hiroshi Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
03 /
Odashima, Hitoshi Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
04 /
Kanda, Naoya Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | |||
05 /
Ueda, Kie Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8820 / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/03] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253435.9 | 30.06.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | JP20050194496 | 04.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005194496 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1744268 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1744268 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
G06K19/0775 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (KR);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16238 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75252 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7565 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81191 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/06] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RFID-Etikett und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/03] | English: | RFID tag and manufacturing method thereof | [2007/03] | French: | Etiquette RFID et procédé de fabrication correspondant | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 18.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1014302 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] *; | [A]US6357106 (OKU MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* column 5, line 9 - column 7, line 38 *; | [A]US2004159709 (OHTA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * | Examination | US2001050138 | WO2004038793 | GB2407094 | EP1555691 | by applicant | US2001050138 |