EP1841159 - Radio communication apparatus and radio communication unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saitou, Naoyuki, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253454.0 | 30.06.2006 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060093791 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006093791 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841159 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H04L5/023 (EP,US);
H04L1/22 (EP,US);
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US);
H04W92/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Funknachrichtenübertragung | [2007/40] | English: | Radio communication apparatus and radio communication unit | [2007/40] | French: | Procedé et appareil de radiocommunications | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |