EP1746352 - Heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bexhall Limited c/o Turner & Ellerby The Guildhall Framlingham Woodbridge Suffolk IP13 9AZ / GB | [2009/17] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states RBR Associates Limited Buildding 846 Bentwaters Parks Rendlesham Woodbridge Suffolk, IP12 2TW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckles, David, c/o RBR Associates Ltd Building 846, Bentwaters Parks Rendlesham, Woodbridge, Suffolk IP12 2TW / GB | 02 /
Holmes, Mark 46 Kings Road Oakham, Rutland LE 15 6PD / GB | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Exell, Jonathan Mark, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Exell, Jonathan Mark, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253789.9 | 19.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | GB20050014800 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0514800 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1746352 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1746352 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746352 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24D11/00, F24D3/08, F24H9/20, F24H9/18 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
F24H9/2021 (EP,US);
F24D11/002 (EP);
F24D3/08 (EP);
F24H9/1818 (EP);
F24D2200/08 (EP);
F24D2200/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Heizungsanlage | [2007/04] | English: | Heating system | [2007/04] | French: | Système de chauffage | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IE | 19.07.2011 | LU | 19.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 19.07.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 19.07.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 19.07.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 19.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4588875 (KOZAK NORMAN M [US], et al) [Y] 2-5* column 1, lines 15-38 *; | [XY]GB2181218 (LOI PETER) [X] 1,6,8,10 * abstract * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | GB2349908 |