EP1750008 - Device and method for engine starting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuya, Masahiko c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takahara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 02 /
Mitsuhori, Atsushi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takahara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 03 /
Katayama, Takatsugu c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takahara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 Avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/06] | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Technical Centre Europe Intellectual Property Department Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253894.7 | 25.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | JP20050227723 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005227723 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750008 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1750008 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
F02N11/08 (EP,US);
F02N2300/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/18] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Starten einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/06] | English: | Device and method for engine starting | [2007/06] | French: | Système et procédé pour démarrage d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001263209 (NISSAN MOTOR) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1106824 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6,9,13,14 * abstract * * claims 5,7 *; | [AP]EP1566532 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [AP] 1,5,6,9,13,14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0022] , [0025] * * figure 4 * | by applicant | JP2001263209 | JP2005227723 |