EP1749976 - Gas turbine comprising a washing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/06] | Washing device and method for a compressor | ||
[2011/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/16] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erickson, Dean M. 5 Ipswich Lane Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | 02 /
Hu, Iris Z. 219 Rock Road Greer, SC 29651 / US | 03 /
Porter, Lane 103 Oak Meadow Drive Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | 04 /
Grove, Gerald Wilson 111 Rashford Way Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | 05 /
Kight, Matthew S. 50 Rocky Creek Road, 185 Greenville SC 29615 / US | 06 /
Schott, Carl G. 106 Rockberry Terrace Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2007/06] | 01 /
Erickson, Dean M. 5 Ipswich Lane Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | ||
02 /
Hu, Iris Z. 219 Rock Road Greer, SC 29651 / US | |||
03 /
Porter, Lane 103 Oak Meadow Drive Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | |||
04 /
Grove, Gerald W. 125 Brendle Drive Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | |||
05 /
Kight, Matthew S. 50 Rocky Creek Road, 185 Greenville SC 29615 / US | |||
06 /
Schott, Carl G. 106 Rockberry Terrace Simpsonville SC 29681 / US | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/43] | Gray, Thomas, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/06] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253911.9 | 27.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | US20050161469 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: US 161469 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1749976 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1749976 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749976 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
F04D29/705 (EP,US);
F01D25/002 (EP,US);
F02C7/1435 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/06] | F01D25/00, F02C7/143 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/14] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbine mit einer Reinigungsanlage | [2011/48] | English: | Gas turbine comprising a washing device | [2011/48] | French: | Turbine à gaz comprenant un dispositif de lavage | [2011/48] |
Former [2007/06] | Waschvorrichtung und -verfahren für einen Kompressor | ||
Former [2007/06] | Washing device and method for a compressor | ||
Former [2007/06] | Dispositif et procédé de lavage d'un compresseur | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 24.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004055334 (GAS TURBINE EFFICIENCY AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 4 - line 7 * * page 5, line 29 - line 31 * * page 6, line 1 * * page 6, line 20 - line 21 * * page 7, line 28 - line 29 * * page 9, line 1 - line 3 * * page 10, line 7 - line 10 * * figures 1,3.B *; | [X]WO2005028119 (GAS TURBINE EFFICIENCY AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - line 26 * * page 3, line 31 - line 32 * * page 4, line 1 - line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - line 22 * * page 6, line 31 - line 32 * * page 7, line 29 - line 31 * * page 8, line 1 - line 3 * * page 9, line 6 - line 7 * * page 9, line 2 - line 3 * * page 10, line 28 - line 29 * * page 13, line 1 - line 2 * * figures 1,5 * | Examination | US4196020 | by applicant | WO2004055334 | US4196020 |