EP1764908 - Electrical power stabilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trainer, David Reginald 45 Brackens Lane, Alvaston Derby, DE24 OAG / GB | 02 /
Cullen, John James Anthony 11 Chase Close, Chellaston Derby, DE73 6WP / GB | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/40] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/12] | Gunn, Michael Alan Company Patents and Licensing Department Rolls-Royce Limited P.O. Box 31 Moor Lane Derby DE2 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254336.8 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | GB20050019019 | 17.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0519019 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764908 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/00 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H02P9/00 (EP,US);
H02P9/102 (EP,US);
H02P2101/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Leistungsstabilisierung | [2007/12] | English: | Electrical power stabilisation | [2007/12] | French: | Stabilisation de puissance électrique | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005093520 (MURAMATSU SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0013] - [0017] - [4856] - [0065] - [0090] - [0092]; figures 1,2,5,8 *; | [X]US2004085047 (SUZUKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0040] , [0051] , [0054] - [0057] - [0064]; figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [A]US6355987 (BIXEL PAUL S [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 15; figures 1-6 * |