EP1760005 - Interlocking roll support and spacing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Northern Corporation P.O. Box 939 Appleton, WI 54912 / US | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swannell, Robert W. 2446 Woodland Terrace Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 02 /
Rosten, David B. 4135 Hill Terrace Drive Sinking Spring, PA 19608 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254517.3 | 30.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | US20050215832 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: US 215832 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760005 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760005 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760005 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65D85/66 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B65D71/70 (EP,US);
B65D85/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2007/47] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ineinandergreifende Stütz- und Abstandshalterstruktur für Rollen | [2007/10] | English: | Interlocking roll support and spacing structure | [2007/10] | French: | Structure emboîtable d'espacement et de support pour des rouleaux | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 15.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.05.2010 | GB | 30.08.2010 | IE | 30.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/43] | IT | 26.05.2010 | |
GB | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 30.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | IT | 26.05.2010 | |
IE | 30.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | IT | 26.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4096986 (FLORIAN JOHN) [Y] 2-4,11-13,16,17,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4098453 (ARNESON EDWIN L) [A] 2-4,11-13,16,18-20* abstract *; | [Y]US4428306 (DRESEN WILLIAM L [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 59 - line 68 *; | [Y]US5435447 (WEATHERFORD JAVIER V [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 7, line 31 - line 48; figure - *; | [Y]US5584408 (ORKISZ RUDOLF P [US]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002063194 (O'MALLEY JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,10,14,15,18 * paragraph [0026] - paragraphs [0029] , [0032]; figure - * [Y] 2-4,7,9,11-13,16,17,19,20 |