EP1762495 - Thermal activation apparatus and printer including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2010/51] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Masanori, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon, 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254645.2 | 06.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | JP20050262301 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005262301 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1762495 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762495 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/25 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
B65C9/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/47] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Thermisches Aktivierungsgerät und Drucker damit | [2007/11] | English: | Thermal activation apparatus and printer including the same | [2007/11] | French: | Appareil d'activation thermique et imprimante comprenant celui-ci | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1052177 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0061] , [0066] - [0069]; figures 1,10-13 *; | [X]EP1568613 (SII P & S INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1388421 (SII P & S INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1672606 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [PX] 1 * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]EP1524193 (SII P & S INC [JP]); | [A]US2005191109 (TAKAHASHI MASANORI [JP], et al) |