EP1762318 - Bar feeding apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unver, Tolga Kirkkonaklar 22, Cad. No: 11/7 06300 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Tolga Univer Kirkkonaklar 22, Cad. No: 11/7 06300 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254753.4 | 13.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | US20050716401P | 13.09.2005 Original published format: US 716401 P | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762318 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Classification | IPC: | B23B13/02 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
B23B13/02 (EP,US);
B23B13/021 (EP,US);
B23B13/10 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stangenzuführeinrichtung und Verfahren | [2007/11] | English: | Bar feeding apparatus and method | [2007/11] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de barres et méthode | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |