EP1763229 - Imaging system for a moving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin, Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama / JP | [2015/24] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Xanavi Informatics Corporation 6-35, Hironodai 2-chome Zama-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinugasa, Toshiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Asoh, Yukio c/o Xanavi Informatics Co. 6-35, Hironodai 2-chome Zama-Shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Takenaga, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2015/34] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
Kinugasa, Toshiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd 12th Floor, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyodu-Ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Asoh, Yukio c/o Xanavi Informatics Co 6-35, Hironodai 2-chome Zama-Shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Takenaga, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd 12th Floor, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyodu-Ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/34] |
Former [2007/11] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254764.1 | 13.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | JP20050265646 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005265646 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763229 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1763229 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763229 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
B60R1/23 (EP,US);
B60R2300/302 (EP,US);
B60R2300/605 (EP,US);
B60R2300/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/34] |
Former [2010/27] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmesystem für bewegende Vorrichtung | [2007/11] | English: | Imaging system for a moving apparatus | [2007/11] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vues pour appareil mobile | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH08297736 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DX] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0066]; figures 1,11 *; | [A]JPH09181962 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0009]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2785434 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 7,14 * abstract *; | [A]DE19950033 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 6,13* abstract *; | [A]JP2005167842 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09181962 | JP2005167842 |