04.08.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
19.05.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.11.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
15.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
16.05.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2007 |
Deletion: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.11.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.11.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
02.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.10.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
02.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |