Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7228017 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2007 | B2 | US2007075225 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24005705 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5607866B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2014 | B2 | JP2007101547 | 19.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US24005705 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1770388 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24005705 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1940607B | 11.08.2010 | B | CN1940607 | 04.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US24005705 | 30.09.2005 |