EP1769841 - Hydrophilic membrane and associated method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duong, Hieu Minh 79 Squire Lane Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 02 /
Koeniger, Rainer 29 Spruce Street Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
Olson, Daniel Robert 1 Crescent Court Voorheesville, NY 12186 / US | 04 /
Zhou, Hongyi 2398 Parkville Place Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 05 /
Brunelle, Daniel Joseph 4 Woods Edge Burnt Hills, NY 12027 / US | 06 /
Olson, Karmin Lorraine 9319 Huhn Boulevard Kansas City, MO 64133 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255038.9 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US20050241227 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 241227 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769841 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769841 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/36, B01D67/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B01D67/0093 (EP,US);
B01D71/36 (EP,US);
B01D71/381 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/103 (EP,US);
H01M8/1053 (EP,US);
H01M8/1058 (EP,US);
H01M8/1081 (EP,US);
B01D2323/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
B01D2323/32 (EP,US);
B01D2325/36 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/50] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydrophile Membran und darauf bezogenes Verfahren | [2007/14] | English: | Hydrophilic membrane and associated method | [2007/14] | French: | Membrane hydrophile et méthode associée | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4778596 (LINDER CHARLES [IL], et al); | [A]EP0408378 (GORE W L & ASS UK [GB]); | [X]US5032282 (LINDER CHARLES [IL], et al) |