EP1769771 - A computer assisted orthopaedic surgical procedure system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disilvestro, Mark R. 238 S Eagle Glen Trial Columbia City IN 46725 / US | 02 /
Sherman, Jason T. 39 N Orchard Dr., No. 8 Warsaw IN 46582 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255072.8 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US20050241530 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 241530 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769771 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, // A61B17/15 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/157 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/108 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2034/252 (EP,US);
A61B2034/254 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | Computer-assistiertes System für die orthopädische Chirurgie | [2007/14] | English: | A computer assisted orthopaedic surgical procedure system | [2007/14] | French: | Système assisté par ordinateur pour la chirurgie orthopédique | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0237935 (KRAUSE NORMAN M [US], et al) [X] 9,10* pages 10,11,19, columns ,24-27 *; | [X]WO02067783 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * pages 1-7; figures 58-60 *; | [X]WO2004070580 (Z KAT INC [US]) [X] 9,10 * page 4 - page 11; figures 1,2,12,15 * |