EP1772959 - Rotor position detection in an electrical machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McClelland, Michael Leo 75 Thornhill Street Calverley Leeds LS28 5PR / GB | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255095.9 | 02.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | GB20050020178 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0520178 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772959 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772959 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02P25/08, G05B13/04 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H02P25/08 (EP,US);
H02P6/16 (KR);
H02P25/089 (EP,US);
H02P25/0925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/51] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ermittlung der Läuferlage bei einer elektrischen Maschine | [2007/15] | English: | Rotor position detection in an electrical machine | [2007/15] | French: | Détection de position d'un rotor de machine électrique | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 12.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1109308 (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,11-18,10,2-9 * paragraphs [0031] , [0052]; figures 3,6-8 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0039] , [0044] , [0085]; figures 5-8 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0052]; figures 6-8 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0039] , [0044] , [0085]; figures 3,5-8 *; | [Y]US2003030406 (TAKAHASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18* paragraphs [0010] , [0046]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2005012486 (CRAIN STEPHEN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0021]; figures 5-10 * |