EP1772811 - System and method for using dummy cycles to mask operations in a secure microcontroller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronic Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | |||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fruhauf, Serge F. 20871 Tula Court Cupertino Santa Clara County CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Pomet, Alain C. Les Bannettes 13790 Rousset / FR | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255105.6 | 03.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US20050243329 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: US 243329 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772811 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772811 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/02, G06F21/00 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
G06F21/755 (EP,US);
G06F21/77 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2123 (EP,US);
H04L2209/046 (EP,US);
H04L2209/08 (EP,US);
H04L2209/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/14] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Verwendung von Dummy-Zyklen zum Maskieren von Operationen in einem sicheren Mikrocontroller | [2009/02] | English: | System and method for using dummy cycles to mask operations in a secure microcontroller | [2007/15] | French: | Système et procédé d'utilisation de cycles factices pour masquer des opérations dans un microcontrôleur sécurisé | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/15] | System und Verfahren zur Verwendung von Dummy-Zyklen zum Maskieren von Operationen in einer sicheren Mikrosteuerung | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5944833 (UGON MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 11,15 * claims 1,10,11 *; | [A]EP1006492 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6804782 (QIU XIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * column 4, line 50; claims 10,11,14,15 * * column 1, lines 34-36 * * the whole document * [Y] 11,15; | [A]US2004233749 (FUJISAKI KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |