EP1777535 - System and method for glitch detection in a secure microcontroller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronic Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | ||
For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | |||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fruhauf, Serge F. 20871 Tula Court Cupertino Santa Clara County, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Pomet, Alain C. Les Bannettes 13790 Rousset / FR | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255109.8 | 03.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050243328 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: US 243328 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777535 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777535 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/317, G06K19/073 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G01R31/31719 (EP,US);
G06K19/07309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/28] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Störsignaldetektion in einem geschützten Mikroprozessor | [2007/17] | English: | System and method for glitch detection in a secure microcontroller | [2007/17] | French: | Système et procédé de détection de signal parasite dans un microcontrolleur sécurisé | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5732249 (MASUDA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column A; figures 1-36; claims 1-25 * * column 1, lines 6,7 * * column 2, line 40 - column 12, line 8 *; | [A]JP2002100980 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-15 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002060595 (NAKANO TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column A; figures 1-10; claims 1-14 ** paragraphs [0002] , [0015] - [0018] *; | [X]US2003214772 (HUGUES JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * column A; figures 1-5; claims 1-12 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0069] *; | [A]US2004044922 (WU CHUNG-HSIAO R [US]) [A] 1-15 * column A; figures 1-13; claims 1-30 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0067] - [0073] * |