EP1777369 - Gas turbine engine assembly and methods of assembling same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orlando, Robert Joseph 7249 Brushwood Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
Moniz, Thomas Ory 3050 Columbia Trail Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255250.0 | 12.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050253416 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: US 253416 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777369 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777369 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D1/26, F02K3/072 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
F02K3/072 (EP,US);
F01D1/26 (EP,US);
F05D2230/60 (EP,US);
F05D2260/40311 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | F01D1/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbinentriebwerksanordnung und Verfahren zu deren Zusammenbau | [2007/17] | English: | Gas turbine engine assembly and methods of assembling same | [2007/17] | French: | Ensemble moteur à turbine à gaz et et son procédé d'assemblage | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 02.02.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4251987 (ADAMSON ARTHUR P) [A] 1,6-8 * figures 1,2 ** column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]GB2150980 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 25 *; | [XAI]US4751816 (PERRY DERICK A [GB]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 5 * [A] 2-5,9,10 [I] 6,7; | [A]US5137425 (ROHRA ALOIS [DE], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 11 * * column 4, line 31 - column 4, line 52 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6158210 (ORLANDO ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,6-8 * figures 2,3,4 * * column 4, line 32 - column 4, line 36 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, line 39 - column 5, line 65 *; | [X]US6381948 (KLINGELS HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 34 - column 2, line 53 * |