EP1775699 - Plasma display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Kirack Buyeong Apt. 106-903 Jung-ri 141, Seokjeok-myeon Chilgok-gun Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Bae, Jongwoon 102-1401 Byeoksan Apt. Bisan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 03 /
Ryu, Seonghwan Na-309, LG Electronics Inc. dormitory, 269-20 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 04 /
Cho, Yoonjoo 302 ho, Sillim 9-dong 1546-12, Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Hwang, Dooyong Poongsan Apt. 101-402 Sanghyeon-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Park, Kirack Buyeong Apt. 106-903 Jung-ri 141, Seokjeok-myeon Chilgok-gun Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | ||
02 /
Bae, Jongwoon Gangbyeon Boseong Apt. 103-1203 Bisan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | |||
03 /
Ryu, Seonghwan Na-309, LG Electronics Inc. dormitory, 269-20 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | |||
04 /
Cho, Yoonjoo 302 ho, Sillim 9-dong 1546-12, Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
Hwang, Dooyong Poongsan Apt. 101-402 Sanghyeon-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255298.9 | 16.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | KR20050097232 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050097232 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775699 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775699 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288, H01J17/49 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G09G3/2983 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/2932 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/26 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0213 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0218 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0227 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | G09G3/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/12] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigevorrichtung | [2007/16] | English: | Plasma display apparatus | [2007/16] | French: | Appareil d'affichage à plasma | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 10.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0945844 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0061] - [0066]; figures 4,9 *; | [Y]US2005184929 (LEE SOO-JIN [KR]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0031] , [0040] - [0051]; figures 8-10 *; | [YA]US2005077824 (KIM YONG-JUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0046] - [0053]; figures 3,5-7 * * paragraph [0064]; figures 6,7 * [A] ; | [YA]US2004155595 (CHIEN YU-TING [TW], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraphs [0031] - [0035]; figures 8,9 * * figures 8,9 * [A] ; | [YA]US2002047558 (WHANG KI WOONG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0055]; figure 6 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0075]; figure 12 * [A] ; | [A]EP1424679 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0124]; figure 18A * | by applicant | EP0945844 | US2005184929 | US2005077824 | US2004155595 | US2002047558 | EP1424679 |