EP1775813 - A raceway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANDUIT CORPORATION 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park Illinois 60477-3091 / US | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandervelde, Charles 545 Aberdeen Road Frankfort, Illinois 60423 / US | 02 /
Woods, Randall T. 3107 King Alford Ct. St. Charles, Illinois 60174 / US | 03 /
Rouleau, Rodney G. 304 Andrea Drive Manhattan, Illinois 60442 / US | 04 /
Zagorski, Craig A. 17248 Long Bow Drive Lockport, Illinois 60441 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255320.1 | 16.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | US20050252157 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: US 252157 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775813 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775813 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H02G3/128 (EP,US);
H02G3/0418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/45] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelkanal | [2007/16] | English: | A raceway | [2007/16] | French: | Canalisation de câbles | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0106535 (MK ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, lines 1-13; figures 8,14,15 * * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 35 * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]GB2370698 (WIREMOLD CO [US]) [Y] 2,8-9 * page 1, lines 4-8; figures 1,5,6,6B,6C,8 * * page 6, lines 21-27 * * page 7, lines 10-26 *; | [Y]GB2174254 (EGA LTD) [Y] 3-6 * page 3, lines 33-37; figure 6 *; | [Y]US6903265 (VANDERVELDE CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, lines 42-55; figures 7-9 * |