|
14.02.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
01.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |