14.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
08.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
Change - priority |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
25.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
07.02.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
28.11.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.09.2007 |
First examination report |
|
26.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
23.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |