EP1777570 - Zoom lens unit, imaging device and photographing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohashi, Kazuyasu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2007/17] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255376.3 | 19.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050304445 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005304445 | [2012/44] |
Former [2007/17] | JP20060304445 | 19.10.2005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777570 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777570 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/173, G02B13/18, G02B1/11 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G02B1/11 (EP,US);
G02B15/143105 (EP,US);
G02B13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zoomobjektiveinheit, Abbildungsvorrichtung und Fotografiervorrichtung | [2007/17] | English: | Zoom lens unit, imaging device and photographing device | [2007/17] | French: | Unité de lentille de zoom, dispositif d'imagerie et dispositif de photographie | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.04.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/48] | ES | 21.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002024745 (OHASHI KAZUYASU [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0089] * * paragraph [0093] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2005092115 (FUJINON CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE4136710 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2003180476 (YAMASHITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * figure 4 * | [Y] - GOBRECHT, H. ED., Bergmann - Schaefer Lehrbuch der Experimentalphysik, Bd. III Optik, BERLIN, WALTER DE GRUYTER, (1987), XP002422674 [Y] 1-17 * page 355, paragraph L - page 356, paragraph 1 * | [A] - MACLEOD H A, "Antireflection coatings", THIN-FILM OPTICAL FILTERS, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (2001), pages 86 - 157, XP002394456 [A] 7 * Chapter 3.2.3 Multilayer Coatings * | Examination | US2003063395 | WO2006011610 |