EP1777488 - Method and apparatus for inspecting an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harding, Kevin George 56 Carrie Court Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255429.0 | 23.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050259344 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 259344 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777488 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777488 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G01B11/254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle eines Objektes | [2007/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for inspecting an object | [2007/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour inspecter un objet | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6084712 (HARDING KEVIN G [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 14 - column 6, line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9007691 (PFISTER KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 14 - page 13, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US4349277 (MUNDY JOSEPH L, et al) [X] 1-5,10 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 1-14 * [A] 6-9; | [XA]US4933541 (DUFOUR MARC [CA]) [X] 1-5,10 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 6-9 |