EP1779898 - Method of epilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taneri, Jim 3 Walnut Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
Chang, Yi Hsin 2855 Pinecreek Drive, F109 Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | 03 /
Akyuz, Rafael 569 Via Almar Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274 / US | 04 /
Goldsberry, Susan 19591 Cloverwood Circle Huntington Beach, CA 92648 / US | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255511.5 | 26.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050260697 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 260697 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779898 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q9/00, A61K8/18, A61K8/25, A61K8/26, A61K8/19, A61K8/73, A61K8/89 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A61Q9/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/00 (KR);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/30 (KR);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61Q9/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Enthaarungsmethode | [2007/18] | English: | Method of epilation | [2007/18] | French: | Procédé d'epilation | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2010 | Observations by third parties | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2289879 (BRYNCZKA TERESA [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03068179 (RECKITT BENCKISER UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004077593 (MARRON SUSAN M [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE102004017376 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A] - RAMOS-E-SILVA, "Hair removal", CLINICS IN DERMATOLOGY, new york, vol. 19, no. 4, pages 437 - 444, URL: http://www.cidjournal.com/article/PIIS0738081X01002000/abstract, (2001), XP002421055 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0738-081X(01)00200-0 | other | FR2635682 |