EP1783429 - Apparatus for injecting fluids into turbines engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/19] | Methods and apparatus for injecting fluids into turbines engines | ||
[2016/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/34] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marakovits, Steve 6087 Mere Drive Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
Durbin, Mark 60 Wright Court Springboro, Ohio 45066 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2016/34] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/19] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255701.2 | 06.11.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | US20050268043 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 268043 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1783429 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1783429 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783429 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34, F23L7/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F23R3/343 (EP,US);
F23L7/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/09] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen von Fluiden in ein Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2016/23] | English: | Apparatus for injecting fluids into turbines engines | [2016/22] | French: | Appareil pour l'injection de fluides dans un moteur de turbine à gaz | [2016/22] |
Former [2007/19] | Verfahren und vorrichtung zum Einspritzen von Fluiden in einem Gasturbinentriebwerk | ||
Former [2007/19] | Methods and apparatus for injecting fluids into turbines engines | ||
Former [2007/19] | Procédé et appareil pour l'injection de fluides dans un moteur de turbine à gaz | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 21.12.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001041454 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 5; | [X]US5361578 (DONLAN JOHN P [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 21 - line 57 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [Y]US6434945 (MANDAI SHIGEMI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 40 - line 47 * * column 6, line 8 - line 33 * * figure 9 * |