EP1788779 - Communication apparatus and communication method for packet alteration detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moritomo, Kazuo c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255843.2 | 15.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | JP20050336005 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005336005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788779 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788779 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
H04W12/10 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (KR);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04W40/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Kommunikationsverfahren zur Detektion von Paketmanipulationen | [2007/21] | English: | Communication apparatus and communication method for packet alteration detection | [2007/21] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la détection de altérations de paquets | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 04.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005091566 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] * * figures 1,3,6,7 *; | [A]US2005086465 (SAPKOTA BHAWANI [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0067] * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - ALTUNBASAK H ET AL, "Alternative Pair-wise Key Exchange Protocols for Robust Security Networks (IEEE 802.11i) in Wireless LANs", SOUTHEASTCON, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA, USA, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2004), ISBN 0-7803-8368-0, pages 77 - 83, XP010697814 [A] 1-17 * page 3, right-hand column, section 2 - page 8, right-hand column, section 5 * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECON.2004.1287901 |