EP1792826 - Means for bearing a propulsion unit and a propulsion system for a waterborne vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Marine AS Dep. Propulsion - Ulstein Sjogt 98 6065 Ulsteinvik / NO | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Richard Geoffrey Postboks 368 6067 Ulsteinvik / NO | 02 /
Viddal, Jan Stale Varleitesvingen 11 6067 Ulsteinvik / NO | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Onsagers Ltd Charles House 5 Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | ||
Former [2007/23] | Briddes, Sam Onsagers Ltd c/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256083.4 | 28.11.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | NO20050005667 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: NO 20055667 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1792826 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1792826 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792826 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/06, B63H20/12, B63H25/42, F16C17/00, B63H5/125 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B63H20/06 (EP,US);
B63H20/12 (EP,US);
B63H25/42 (EP,US);
B63H5/125 (EP,US);
B63H2005/1256 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/23] | B63H20/06, B63H20/12, B63H25/42, F16C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Lagerung eines Antriebssystems und Antriebssystem für ein Wasserfahrzeug | [2007/23] | English: | Means for bearing a propulsion unit and a propulsion system for a waterborne vessel | [2007/23] | French: | Moyen pour supporter une unité de propulsion et système de propulsion pour une embarcation | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 27.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | LU | 28.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/22] |
Former [2010/30] | SI | 18.03.2009 | |
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | SI | 18.03.2009 | |
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1107550 (INST SCHIFFBAU) [X] 12-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US3734050 (KITAI T, et al) [X] 12-27 * column 2, line 43 - line 51; figure - *; | [A]DE3326415 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO8905262 (KAMEWA AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * page 4 - page 10; figure - *; | [A]EP0590867 (KVAERNER MASA YARDS OY [FI]) [A] 1-7,10,11 * column 5, line 21 - column 8, line 45; figure - *; | [A]US5324560 (OBLANDER M DUANE [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0719900 (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0831026 (KVAERNER MASA YARDS OY [FI]) [X] 12-17,19,21-23,25,27 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]WO0181170 (ROLLS ROYCE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-29* abstract *; | [A]WO03093102 (VOLVO PENTA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |