blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1795647

EP1795647 - Dewatering and thickening belt and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2012  [2012/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON FILCON CO., LTD.
2220 Omaru Inagi-shi
Tokyo / JP
[2007/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Nakajima, Tatsutoshi
c/o Nippon Filcon Co., Ltd. Shizuoka Office
1780 Atsuhara Fuji-shi Shizuoka / JP
 [2007/24]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/24]Turner, James Arthur, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date06256233.507.12.2006
[2007/24]
Priority number, dateJP2005035340107.12.2005         Original published format: JP 2005353401
[2007/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1795647
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1795647
Date:26.08.2009
[2009/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:D21F1/80, D21C9/18, D21F1/00
[2007/24]
CPC:
D21F1/0036 (EP,US); D21C9/18 (EP,US); D21F1/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US); Y10T428/24785 (EP,US); Y10T428/24793 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2369 (EP,US); Y10T442/3179 (EP,US); Y10T442/3195 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/24]
TitleGerman:Entwässerungs- und Eindickungsband und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2007/24]
English:Dewatering and thickening belt and manufacturing method thereof[2007/24]
French:Bande de déshydratation et d'épaississement et son procédé de fabrication[2007/24]
Examination procedure16.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/13]
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/15]
11.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2012/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
22.12.2010Request for further processing filed
22.12.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.01.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0712957  (NIPPON FILCON KK [JP]);
 [Y]WO03071027  (ALBANY INT CORP [US]);
 [Y]EP1365066  (NIPPON FILCON KK [JP]);
 [Y]US2004079434  (MARTIN CHAD A [US], et al)
by applicantEP0712957
 JPH08144185
 WO03071027
 EP1365066
 US2004079434
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.