EP1796171 - Flat panel display and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Tae-Wook Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Won-Kyu Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Jeong-Bai Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Moon-Hee Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Sung, Dong-Young Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/48] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
Kang, Tae-Wook Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwak, Won-Kyu Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Choi, Jeong-Bai Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Moon-Hee Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Sung, Dong-Young Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2019/48] |
Former [2007/24] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256263.2 | 08.12.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | KR20050120759 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050120759 | KR20050123994 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050123994 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1796171 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1796171 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1796171 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L27/12, H01L51/52, H01L29/45 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H01L27/124 (EP,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H01L27/1214 (US);
H01L27/1248 (EP,US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/124 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/48] |
Former [2011/26] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flachbildschirm und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/24] | English: | Flat panel display and method of fabricating the same | [2007/24] | French: | Panneau d'affichage plat et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001230085 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,8-13 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003133078 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,8-13* abstract *; | [X]GB2396733 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,6,8-15,19,21,22 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0107] * * figures 8F,9F,10F,11F,13E *; | [X]US2004134878 (MATSUSHITA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0089] * * figures 3E,6D,10E * |