EP1797946 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A HIGH STABILITY MICROCAPSULE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/25] | Process for preparing a high stability microcapsule product and method for using same | ||
[2017/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc. 521 West 57th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [2017/21] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC. 521 West 57th Street New York New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kaiping 105 Bramble Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 02 /
Popplewell, Lewis Michael 617 Vale Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 03 /
Anastasiou, Theodore James 12 Ladwood Drive Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2007/25] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256318.4 | 12.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | US20050304090 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 304090 | US20060549998 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: US 549998 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1797946 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1797946 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797946 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B01J13/02 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (EP,US);
B01J13/20 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/21] |
Former [2010/46] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHSTABILEN MIKROKAPSELPRODUKTES UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A HIGH STABILITY MICROCAPSULE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR USING SAME | [2017/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE MICROCAPSULE HAUTEMENT STABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2017/08] |
Former [2007/25] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines hochstabilen Mikrokapselproduktes und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2007/25] | Process for preparing a high stability microcapsule product and method for using same | ||
Former [2007/25] | Procédé pour la préparation d'une microcapsule hautement stable et son procédé d'utilisation | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17166100.2 / EP3210666 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.05.2017 | [2018/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005129946 (HAYASHI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,13 * claims 1,6,7 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0112] * [I] 5-12,14-16; | [XI]US2004195711 (HAYASHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * claims 9,11 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0025] , [0026] , [0027] , [0093] * [I] 5-12,14-16; | [XI]WO2004024313 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * example 4 * [I] 5-12,14-16; | [XI]US5962134 (SHAH JAYESH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * claims 2-4,7 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 41 - line 52 * [I] 5-12,14-16; | [XI]US5605966 (SCHULER BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 22 * [I] 5-12,14-16; | [XI]US4956129 (SCHER HERBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7-9,13 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 24 - line 30 * [I] 3-6,10-12,14-16; | [XI]US5332584 (SCHER HERBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7-9,13 * column 2, line 27 - line 61 * * column 3, line 5 - line 37 * [I] 3-6,10-12,14-16; | [XI]WO9314865 (SCHER HERBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7-9,13 * claims 1,2 * * page 5 - page 6 * [I] 3-6,10-12,14-16; | [XI]US4694905 (ARMBRUSTER DAVID R [US]) [X] 1-2,13 * claim 8 * * column 4, line 14 - line 40 * [I] 3-12,14-16; | [XI]US5160529 (SCHER HERBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-2,13 * claims 28,30-31 * [I] 3-12,14-16; | [XI]US2002004059 (VAN KOPPENHAGEN JUANITA ELENA [US], et al) [X] 1-2,13 * claim 50 * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 3-12,14-16; | [XI]US2002037306 (VAN KOPPENHAGEN JUANITA E [US], et al) [X] 1-2,13 * claim 50 * * paragraph [0052] * [I] 3-12,14-16 | by applicant | US2005129946 | US2004195711 | WO2004024313 | US5962134 | US5605966 | US4956129 | US5332584 | US5160529 | WO9314865 | US4694905 | US2002004059 | US2002037306 |