EP1801520 - Air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Appliances, Inc. 16-1, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokozeki, Atsuhiko c/o Shimizu Works, Hitachi Air Conditioning Systems Co. Ltd. 390, Shimizumuramatsu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken 424-0926 / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Kenji c/o Shimizu Works Hitachi Air Conditioning Systems Co. Ltd. 390, Shimizumuramatsu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken 424-0926 / JP | 03 /
Nakayama, Susumu c/o Shimizu Works Hitachi Air Conditioning Systems Co. Ltd. 390, Shimizumuramatsu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken 424-0926 / JP | 04 /
Sugimoto, Naoki c/o Shimizu Works Hitachi Air Conditioning Systems Co. Ltd. 390, Shimizumuramatsu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken 424-0926 / JP | 05 /
Tsukada, Yoshiharu c/o Shimizu Works Hitachi Air Conditioning Systems Co. Ltd. 390, Shimizumuramatsu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken 424-0926 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256498.4 | 21.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | JP20050371785 | 26.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005371785 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801520 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801520 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F24F3/153 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP);
F24F11/52 (EP,US);
F24F3/153 (EP);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F2003/144 (EP);
F24F2110/20 (EP);
F25B2313/02321 (EP);
F25B2313/02343 (EP);
F25B2313/02741 (EP);
F25B2313/0314 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2700/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage | [2007/26] | English: | Air conditioning system | [2007/26] | French: | Système de conditionnement d'air | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 29.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07294060 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000274879 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]JP2003262429 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004293941 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]JP2005283058 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [PX]JP2006194525 (HITACHI LTD) [PX] 1-3 * abstract *; | [PX]JP2006200869 (HITACHI LTD) [PX] 1-3 * abstract * |